U.S. District Court for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-mc-00093
  • Case Name: USA v. NH, State of et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 10, 2020: [Judgment - Miscellaneous Case]
  • December 10, 2020: [Order on Motion to Expedite]
  • December 04, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
  • December 03, 2020: [Expedite]
  • December 01, 2020: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • December 01, 2020: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
November, 2020
  • November 20, 2020: [Order]
  • November 20, 2020: [Report and Recommendation]
  • November 19, 2020: [Letter]
  • November 19, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • November 19, 2020: [Notice - ECF]
  • November 19, 2020: [Case Assigned]
  • November 19, 2020: [Z-Applications]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.