U.S. District Court for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-mj-00215-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Moctezuma-Pacheco
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 29, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 09, 2020: [Detention Order]
  • December 08, 2020: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • December 08, 2020: [Consent to Video/Telephonic Conference Waiver to Appear in Person]
  • December 08, 2020: [Stipulation to Detention and/or Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • December 08, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • December 08, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • December 08, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 08, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 08, 2020: [Order]
  • December 03, 2020: [Hearing Notice]
November, 2020
  • November 20, 2020: [Warrant Issued]
  • November 20, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.