U.S. District Court for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-mc-00095
  • Case Name: Single Digits, Inc. v. Guest Tek Interactive Entertainment, Ltd.
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 02, 2021: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
February, 2021
  • February 18, 2021: [Order on Motion to Quash]
December, 2020
  • December 31, 2020: [Surreply to Reply]
  • December 28, 2020: [Attorney Appearance]
  • December 23, 2020: [Reply to Objection to Motion]
  • December 23, 2020: [ECF - Filing Error - Action Required]
  • December 21, 2020: [Response - not to Motion]
  • December 11, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend Time to Object/Respond]
  • December 09, 2020: [Extend Time to Object/Respond]
  • December 07, 2020: [Objection to Motion]
  • December 07, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 04, 2020: [Disclosure Statement]
  • December 04, 2020: [Case Opening Error]
  • December 03, 2020: [Disclosure Statement]
  • December 03, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 03, 2020: [Attorney Appearance]
  • December 02, 2020: [Attorney Appearance]
  • December 01, 2020: [Notice - ECF]
  • December 01, 2020: [Case Assigned]
November, 2020
  • November 23, 2020: [Fee Paid]
  • November 23, 2020: [Quash]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.