U.S. District Court for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-mc-00094
  • Case Name: In Re: Pilatus Bank PLC
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 11, 2021: [Judgment]
  • May 11, 2021: [Order]
April, 2021
  • April 19, 2021: [Response - not to Motion]
  • April 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • April 06, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • April 05, 2021: [Order]
  • April 05, 2021: [~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 02, 2021: [Extend Time]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Response - not to Motion]
  • March 29, 2021: [Extend Time]
  • March 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Exceed]
  • March 25, 2021: [Exceed]
  • March 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: [Extend Time]
  • February 19, 2021: [Objection not to motion]
January, 2021
  • January 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend Time to Answer]
  • January 15, 2021: [Extend Time to Answer]
  • January 15, 2021: [Attorney Appearance]
  • January 15, 2021: [ECF - Filing Error - Action Required]
  • January 15, 2021: [Stipulation]
  • January 08, 2021: [ECF - Filing Error - Info Only]
  • January 08, 2021: [Affidavit of Service]
December, 2020
  • December 28, 2020: [Summons - Waiver Issued]
  • December 22, 2020: [Attorney Appearance]
  • December 22, 2020: [Miscellaneous Filing]
  • December 10, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 09, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 02, 2020: [Order]
  • December 02, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Case Reassigned]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.