U.S. District Court for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-mc-00109
  • Case Name: USA v. $29,000.00 US Currency
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 01, 2021: [Extend Time]
February, 2021
  • February 08, 2021: [Set Deadlines PUBLIC]
  • February 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • February 01, 2021: [Extend Time]
December, 2020
  • December 17, 2020: [Order]
  • December 16, 2020: [Notice - ECF]
  • December 16, 2020: [Case Assigned]
  • December 15, 2020: [Miscellaneous Case - New Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.