U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-00154-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sacara
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 03, 2021: [Collateral Returned]
November, 2021
  • November 04, 2021: [Collateral Return Acknowledgment]
September, 2021
  • September 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
  • September 14, 2021: [Judgment]
  • September 13, 2021: [Early Termination of Probation]
  • September 08, 2021: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
  • September 08, 2021: [Order]
  • September 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Return of Property]
  • September 08, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • September 07, 2021: [Return of Property]
July, 2021
  • July 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Expedite]
  • July 15, 2021: [Expedite]
  • July 12, 2021: [Collateral Receipt]
  • July 01, 2021: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Hearing Notice]
  • June 28, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 25, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
May, 2021
  • May 05, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • May 03, 2021: [Continue Trial]
March, 2021
  • March 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • March 04, 2021: [Continue Trial]
January, 2021
  • January 19, 2021: [Summons Returned Unexecuted]
  • January 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • January 08, 2021: [Continue Trial]
  • January 04, 2021: [Endorsed Order - Trial Status Report]
December, 2020
  • December 30, 2020: [Transcript]
  • December 22, 2020: [Trial Notice]
  • December 22, 2020: [Order]
  • December 21, 2020: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
  • December 18, 2020: [Summons Issued]
  • December 18, 2020: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • December 18, 2020: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.