U.S. District Court for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-mj-00217-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Chaput et al.
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 19, 2021: [Removal/Rule 5c 3 Documents Received]
  • February 18, 2021: [Extend Time to Indict]
  • February 17, 2021: [Miscellaneous Filing]
  • February 17, 2021: [Extend Time to Indict]
  • February 17, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 17, 2021: [Transcript]
  • February 12, 2021: [Hearing Notice]
  • February 09, 2021: [Clerk's Notice - Filing Due]
  • February 02, 2021: [Arrest - Other District]
January, 2021
  • January 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend Time to Indict]
  • January 22, 2021: [Extend Time to Indict]
  • January 22, 2021: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 22, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 22, 2021: [Exhibit List]
  • January 22, 2021: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • January 22, 2021: [Order]
  • January 21, 2021: [Motion Hearing Notice]
  • January 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 21, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • January 21, 2021: [Show Cause Hearing]
  • January 21, 2021: [Bail Revocation Hearing]
  • January 21, 2021: [Order]
  • January 20, 2021: [Hearing Notice]
  • January 14, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 14, 2021: [Miscellaneous Filing]
  • January 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend Time to Indict]
  • January 13, 2021: [Extend Time to Indict]
  • January 12, 2021: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 12, 2021: [Endorsed Order - Brady]
  • January 12, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 12, 2021: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • January 12, 2021: [Consent to Video/Telephonic Conference Waiver to Appear in Person]
  • January 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • January 12, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • January 12, 2021: [Order]
  • January 11, 2021: [Removal/Rule 5c 3 Documents Received]
  • January 08, 2021: [Arrest - Other District]
  • January 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
December, 2020
  • December 31, 2020: [Continue]
  • December 29, 2020: [Transcript]
  • December 29, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 23, 2020: [Hearing Notice]
  • December 23, 2020: [Removal/Rule 5c 3 Documents Received]
  • December 22, 2020: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • December 22, 2020: [Unseal Case]
  • December 22, 2020: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.