U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-00158-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Kuiper
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Judgment]
  • May 26, 2021: [Forfeiture Order]
  • May 26, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • May 24, 2021: [Forfeiture]
  • May 18, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • May 17, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum]
April, 2021
  • April 20, 2021: [Service by Publication]
  • April 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 19, 2021: [ECF - Filing Error - Info Only]
  • April 16, 2021: [Continue]
  • April 16, 2021: [ECF - Filing Error - Action Required]
  • April 15, 2021: [Notice - Other]
January, 2021
  • January 22, 2021: [Forfeiture Order]
  • January 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • January 21, 2021: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 21, 2021: [Forfeiture]
  • January 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Excuse]
  • January 14, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment/Plea Hearing]
  • January 14, 2021: [Excuse]
  • January 12, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
December, 2020
  • December 23, 2020: [Hearing Notice]
  • December 23, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 23, 2020: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.