U.S. District Court for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-fp-01188
  • Case Name: Clervrain v. Erichs
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2021
  • May 19, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2021
  • April 02, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2021
  • March 03, 2021: [Filing Fee Omitted Notice]
  • March 03, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2021
  • February 04, 2021: [Notice - Mail Returned]
December, 2020
  • December 28, 2020: [Filing Fee Omitted Notice]
  • December 28, 2020: [Notice - ECF]
  • December 28, 2020: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs]
  • December 28, 2020: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus-2241]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.