U.S. District Court for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00002-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Larabee
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 14, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 12, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 08, 2021: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • January 08, 2021: [Detention Order]
  • January 08, 2021: [Endorsed Order - Brady]
  • January 08, 2021: [Stipulation to Detention and/or Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • January 08, 2021: [Consent to Video/Telephonic Conference Waiver to Appear in Person]
  • January 08, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 08, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • January 08, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • January 08, 2021: [Order]
  • January 07, 2021: [Hearing Notice]
  • January 07, 2021: [Arrest]
  • January 04, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • January 04, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.