U.S. District Court for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00006-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mehlhorn
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 24, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • June 22, 2021: [Extend Time to Indict]
April, 2021
  • April 27, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • April 22, 2021: [Extend Time to Indict]
  • April 22, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • April 22, 2021: [Clerk's Notice - Filing Due]
March, 2021
  • March 29, 2021: [Extend Time to Indict]
February, 2021
  • February 03, 2021: [Response - not to motion]
  • February 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend Time to Indict]
  • February 01, 2021: [Extend Time to Indict]
January, 2021
  • January 15, 2021: [Stipulation to Detention and/or Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • January 15, 2021: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • January 15, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • January 15, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • January 15, 2021: [Order]
  • January 14, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 12, 2021: [Detention Order - Temporary]
  • January 12, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 12, 2021: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • January 12, 2021: [Consent to Video/Telephonic Conference Waiver to Appear in Person]
  • January 12, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 12, 2021: [Order]
  • January 11, 2021: [Hearing Notice]
  • January 11, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • January 11, 2021: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.