U.S. District Court for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-mj-00229-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Winegar
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Transcript]
February, 2021
  • February 04, 2021: [Detention Order]
January, 2021
  • January 28, 2021: [Consent to Video/Telephonic Conference Waiver to Appear in Person]
  • January 28, 2021: [Order]
  • January 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 27, 2021: [Continue]
  • January 27, 2021: [Order]
  • January 15, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 15, 2021: [Stipulation to Detention and/or Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • January 14, 2021: [Order]
  • January 13, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • January 13, 2021: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
  • January 13, 2021: [Endorsed Order - Brady]
  • January 12, 2021: [Detention Order - Temporary]
  • January 12, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 12, 2021: [Consent to Video/Telephonic Conference Waiver to Appear in Person]
  • January 12, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 12, 2021: [Order]
  • January 12, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 12, 2021: [Hearing Notice]
  • January 12, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • January 12, 2021: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.