U.S. District Court for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mc-00005
  • Case Name: USA v. $20,000 US Currency
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 13, 2021: [Extend Time]
  • April 05, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
March, 2021
  • March 17, 2021: [Extend Time]
January, 2021
  • January 14, 2021: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • January 14, 2021: [Notice - ECF]
  • January 14, 2021: [Case Assigned]
  • January 12, 2021: [Miscellaneous Case - New Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.