U.S. District Court for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00013-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wright
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [CJA 20 Payment Information]
January, 2021
  • January 22, 2021: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • January 22, 2021: [Commitment to Another District]
  • January 22, 2021: [Stipulation to Detention and/or Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • January 22, 2021: [Waiver of Removal/Rule 5 c 3 Hearing]
  • January 22, 2021: [Consent to Video/Telephonic Conference Waiver to Appear in Person]
  • January 22, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 22, 2021: [Order]
  • January 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 19, 2021: [Continue]
  • January 15, 2021: [Detention Order - Temporary]
  • January 15, 2021: [Waiver of Removal/Rule 5 c 3 Hearing]
  • January 15, 2021: [Removal Hearing]
  • January 15, 2021: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • January 15, 2021: [Consent to Video/Telephonic Conference Waiver to Appear in Person]
  • January 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • January 15, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • January 15, 2021: [Order]
  • January 14, 2021: [Hearing Notice]
  • January 14, 2021: [Removal Documents]
  • January 14, 2021: [Arrest - Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.