U.S. District Court for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00018-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Farnham
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 15, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 01, 2022: [Stipulation]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Extend Time to Indict]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Stipulation]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Extend Time to Indict]
May, 2022
  • May 06, 2022: [Stipulation]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Extend Time to Indict]
March, 2022
  • March 15, 2022: [Stipulation]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Extend Time to Indict]
January, 2022
  • January 10, 2022: [Stipulation]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Extend Time to Indict]
November, 2021
  • November 04, 2021: [Stipulation]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Extend Time to Indict]
September, 2021
  • September 09, 2021: [Stipulation]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Extend Time to Indict]
June, 2021
  • June 24, 2021: [Stipulation]
  • June 24, 2021: [Extend Time to Indict]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [Stipulation]
  • April 14, 2021: [Extend Time to Indict]
March, 2021
  • March 03, 2021: [Clerk's Notice - Filing Due]
February, 2021
  • February 21, 2021: [Miscellaneous Filing]
  • February 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend Time to Indict]
  • February 09, 2021: [Extend Time to Indict]
  • February 01, 2021: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 01, 2021: [Stipulation to Detention and/or Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • February 01, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 01, 2021: [Order]
  • February 01, 2021: [Stipulation]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Stipulation]
  • January 27, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 26, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • January 25, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 25, 2021: [Detention Order - Temporary]
  • January 25, 2021: [Endorsed Order - Brady]
  • January 25, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 25, 2021: [Order]
  • January 22, 2021: [Miscellaneous Filing]
  • January 22, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 21, 2021: [ECF - Filing Error - Action Required]
  • January 21, 2021: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 20, 2021: [Hearing Notice]
  • January 20, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • January 20, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.