U.S. District Court for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mc-00004
  • Case Name: Heal v. Murgo
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 04, 2022: [Judgment - Miscellaneous Case]
  • January 04, 2022: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • January 04, 2022: [Status Conference]
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
June, 2021
  • June 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • June 02, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: [Certificate of Service]
April, 2021
  • April 19, 2021: [Order]
  • April 16, 2021: [Hearing Notice]
  • April 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [Discovery]
February, 2021
  • February 09, 2021: [Certificate of Service]
  • February 08, 2021: [Order]
January, 2021
  • January 25, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 21, 2021: [Case Assigned]
  • January 21, 2021: [Notice - ECF]
  • January 21, 2021: [Fee Paid]
  • January 21, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 21, 2021: [Quash]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.