U.S. District Court for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00028-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Dean
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 17, 2021: [Detention Order]
  • February 09, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 09, 2021: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • February 09, 2021: [Order]
  • February 05, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 04, 2021: [Detention Order - Temporary]
  • February 04, 2021: [Endorsed Order - Brady]
  • February 04, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • February 04, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • February 04, 2021: [Consent to Video/Telephonic Conference Waiver to Appear in Person]
  • February 04, 2021: [Order]
  • February 03, 2021: [Hearing Notice]
  • February 03, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • February 03, 2021: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.