U.S. District Court for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00054-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Oberfeldt
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend Time to Indict]
  • April 08, 2021: [Extend Time to Indict]
March, 2021
  • March 22, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 17, 2021: [Stipulation to Detention and/or Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • March 17, 2021: [Endorsed Order - Brady]
  • March 17, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 17, 2021: [Consent to Video/Telephonic Conference Waiver to Appear in Person]
  • March 17, 2021: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • March 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • March 17, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 17, 2021: [Order]
  • March 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 16, 2021: [Continue]
  • March 15, 2021: [Hearing Notice]
  • March 15, 2021: [Arrest]
  • March 12, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • March 12, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.