U.S. District Court for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mc-00021
  • Case Name: Reffett v. Rapides Parish Sheriffs Office et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 22, 2021: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
  • April 16, 2021: [Case Reassigned]
  • April 13, 2021: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
March, 2021
  • March 26, 2021: [Report and Recommendation]
  • March 25, 2021: [Case Assigned]
  • March 25, 2021: [Notice - ECF]
  • March 25, 2021: [Z-Registration of Foreign Judgment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.