U.S. District Court for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00091-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Taylor
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 10, 2021: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend Time to Indict]
  • April 28, 2021: [Extend Time to Indict]
  • April 14, 2021: [Attorney Withdrawal]
  • April 14, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 13, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 09, 2021: [Detention Order]
  • April 09, 2021: [Stipulation to Detention and/or Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • April 09, 2021: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • April 09, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 08, 2021: [Order]
  • April 08, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 07, 2021: [Detention Order - Temporary]
  • April 07, 2021: [Endorsed Order - Brady]
  • April 07, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 07, 2021: [Consent to Video/Telephonic Conference Waiver to Appear in Person]
  • April 07, 2021: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • April 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • April 07, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 06, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 06, 2021: [Order]
  • April 06, 2021: [Hearing Notice]
  • April 06, 2021: [Arrest]
  • April 02, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • April 02, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.