U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00070-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Reuter
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • October 27, 2022: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
March, 2022
  • March 16, 2022: [Judgment]
  • March 16, 2022: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
  • March 16, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • March 07, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum]
December, 2021
  • December 06, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Acknowledgment and Waiver of Rights]
  • October 13, 2021: [Stipulation]
  • October 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • October 06, 2021: [Order]
  • October 06, 2021: [Continue Trial]
  • October 04, 2021: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • October 04, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: [Hearing Notice]
  • September 23, 2021: [Bail Revocation Hearing]
  • September 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 10, 2021: [Continue]
  • September 09, 2021: [Petition on Probation/SR/Bail - Order - Summons/Public Warrant]
August, 2021
  • August 13, 2021: [Stipulation]
  • August 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • August 09, 2021: [Order]
  • August 04, 2021: [Continue Trial]
June, 2021
  • June 16, 2021: [Stipulation]
  • June 16, 2021: [Clerk's Notice - Filing Due]
  • June 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • June 02, 2021: [Order]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Continue Trial]
  • May 28, 2021: [Endorsed Order - Trial Status Report]
  • May 06, 2021: [Trial Notice]
  • May 06, 2021: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 06, 2021: [Initial Appearance/Arraignment]
  • May 06, 2021: [Endorsed Order - Brady]
  • May 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • May 06, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • May 06, 2021: [Consent to Video/Telephonic Conference Waiver to Appear in Person]
  • May 06, 2021: [Order]
April, 2021
  • April 27, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 20, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • April 20, 2021: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • April 20, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.