U.S. District Court for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00116-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Daffin
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • June 15, 2022: [ECF - Filing Error - Info Only]
  • June 14, 2022: [Extend Time]
  • June 14, 2022: [Extend Time to Indict]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Miscellaneous Filing]
  • May 19, 2022: [Extend Time to Indict]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Miscellaneous Filing]
  • April 18, 2022: [Extend Time to Indict]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Miscellaneous Filing]
  • March 11, 2022: [Extend Time to Indict]
  • March 11, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Stipulation]
  • January 12, 2022: [Extend Time to Indict]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Miscellaneous Filing]
  • November 12, 2021: [Extend Time to Indict]
September, 2021
  • September 22, 2021: [Miscellaneous Filing]
  • September 10, 2021: [Extend Time to Indict]
August, 2021
  • August 05, 2021: [Stipulation]
July, 2021
  • July 20, 2021: [Clerk's Notice - Filing Due]
  • July 09, 2021: [Order]
  • July 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • July 09, 2021: [Extend Time to Indict]
  • July 09, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • July 01, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 21, 2021: [Attorney Withdrawal]
  • June 21, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 21, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 16, 2021: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • June 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend Time to Indict]
  • June 04, 2021: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 04, 2021: [Extend Time to Indict]
May, 2021
  • May 21, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 21, 2021: [Order]
  • May 21, 2021: [Motion Hearing Notice]
  • May 20, 2021: [Endorsed Order - Brady]
  • May 20, 2021: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • May 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • May 20, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • May 20, 2021: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
  • May 12, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 12, 2021: [Hearing Notice]
  • May 12, 2021: [Arrest - Other District]
  • May 11, 2021: [Removal/Rule 5c 3 Documents Received]
  • May 11, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.