U.S. District Court for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00114-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jonathan Cruz-Marte
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 20, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 19, 2021: [Detention Order]
  • May 19, 2021: [Exhibit List]
  • May 19, 2021: [Order]
  • May 17, 2021: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • May 17, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 17, 2021: [Order]
  • May 13, 2021: [Detention Order - Temporary]
  • May 13, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 13, 2021: [Endorsed Order - Brady]
  • May 13, 2021: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • May 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • May 13, 2021: [Consent to Video/Telephonic Conference Waiver to Appear in Person]
  • May 13, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • May 12, 2021: [Order]
  • May 12, 2021: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
  • May 12, 2021: [Hearing Notice]
  • May 12, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • May 12, 2021: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.