U.S. District Court for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00119-1
  • Case Name: In Re: Extradition of Ronni Frank Maraj
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [CJA 20 Payment Information]
August, 2021
  • August 06, 2021: [Collateral Returned]
July, 2021
  • July 13, 2021: [Collateral Returned]
  • July 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Collateral Receipt]
  • June 08, 2021: [Collateral Receipt]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Order]
  • May 27, 2021: [Affidavit]
  • May 27, 2021: [Extradition Hearing]
  • May 19, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 14, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 14, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Bail]
  • May 14, 2021: [Consent to Video/Telephonic Conference Waiver to Appear in Person]
  • May 14, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • May 14, 2021: [Bail]
  • May 13, 2021: [Hearing Notice]
  • May 13, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • May 13, 2021: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.