U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00091-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Pike
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
  • October 18, 2022: [Judgment]
  • October 14, 2022: [Exhibit]
  • October 14, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • October 13, 2022: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • October 11, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum]
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
August, 2022
  • August 16, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 15, 2022: [Stipulation to Detention and/or Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • August 15, 2022: [Bail Revocation Hearing]
  • August 15, 2022: [Arrest]
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: [Sentencing]
April, 2022
  • April 11, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment/Plea Hearing]
  • April 07, 2022: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 06, 2022: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 06, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • April 06, 2022: [Order]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines PUBLIC]
  • March 24, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 24, 2022: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • January 12, 2022: [Continue Trial]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
November, 2021
  • November 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • November 09, 2021: [Continue Trial]
October, 2021
  • October 05, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 01, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2021
  • August 18, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • August 10, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 06, 2021: [Continue Trial]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Endorsed Order - Trial Status Report]
  • July 30, 2021: [Trial Notice]
  • July 29, 2021: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 29, 2021: [Endorsed Order - Brady]
  • July 29, 2021: [Initial Appearance/Arraignment]
  • July 29, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 29, 2021: [Consent to Video/Telephonic Conference Waiver to Appear in Person]
  • July 29, 2021: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • July 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • July 29, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • July 29, 2021: [Order]
  • July 26, 2021: [Removal/Rule 5c 3 Documents Received]
  • July 26, 2021: [Hearing Notice]
  • July 23, 2021: [Arrest - Other District]
May, 2021
  • May 19, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • May 19, 2021: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • May 19, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.