U.S. District Court for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00131-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rodriguez
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 21, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • June 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend Time to Indict]
  • June 16, 2021: [Extend Time to Indict]
  • June 16, 2021: [ECF - Filing Error - Action Required]
  • June 16, 2021: [Continue]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • May 26, 2021: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 26, 2021: [Stipulation to Detention and/or Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • May 26, 2021: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • May 26, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 26, 2021: [Order]
  • May 21, 2021: [Endorsed Order - Brady]
  • May 21, 2021: [Detention Order - Temporary]
  • May 21, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 21, 2021: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • May 21, 2021: [Consent to Video/Telephonic Conference Waiver to Appear in Person]
  • May 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • May 21, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • May 21, 2021: [Order]
  • May 20, 2021: [Hearing Notice]
  • May 20, 2021: [Complaint]
  • May 20, 2021: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.