U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00069-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mann
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Letter]
August, 2022
  • August 02, 2022: [CJA 20 Payment Information]
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: [Judgment]
  • July 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • July 11, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • July 11, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • July 08, 2022: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
  • July 05, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum]
March, 2022
  • March 22, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment/Plea Hearing]
  • March 22, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • March 15, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines PUBLIC]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • February 24, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • February 23, 2022: [Continue Trial]
  • February 22, 2022: [Final Pretrial Conference]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • December 16, 2021: [Continue Trial]
  • December 13, 2021: [Trial Reminder]
November, 2021
  • November 02, 2021: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • October 26, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
September, 2021
  • September 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • September 14, 2021: [Continue Trial]
July, 2021
  • July 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • July 07, 2021: [Continue Trial]
June, 2021
  • June 25, 2021: [Endorsed Order - Trial Status Report]
  • June 16, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 10, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • June 08, 2021: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • June 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • June 07, 2021: [Trial Notice]
  • June 07, 2021: [Stipulation to Detention and/or Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • June 07, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • June 07, 2021: [Consent to Video/Telephonic Conference Waiver to Appear in Person]
  • June 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 07, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 07, 2021: [Endorsed Order - Brady]
  • June 07, 2021: [Initial Appearance/Arraignment]
  • June 07, 2021: [Order]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: [Hearing Notice]
  • May 26, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • May 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • May 26, 2021: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.