U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00093-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Keene
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • January 28, 2022: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
December, 2021
  • December 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 03, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
October, 2021
  • October 13, 2021: [Judgment]
  • October 13, 2021: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
  • October 13, 2021: [Sentencing]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • September 29, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • September 29, 2021: [Sealed Motion - Court Use]
  • September 29, 2021: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • September 26, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • June 29, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • June 29, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment/Plea Hearing]
  • June 29, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • June 09, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • June 03, 2021: [Organizational Victim]
  • June 02, 2021: [Hearing Notice]
  • June 01, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 01, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.