U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00096-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Yule
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Letter]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Transcript]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Letter]
July, 2022
  • July 08, 2022: [CJA 20 Payment Information]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Judgment]
  • May 25, 2022: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
  • May 24, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • May 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Downward Departure]
  • May 16, 2022: [Downward Departure]
  • May 16, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • May 05, 2022: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
April, 2022
  • April 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 02, 2022: [Continue]
January, 2022
  • January 14, 2022: [In Chambers Conference]
  • January 07, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • January 07, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 07, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment/Plea Hearing]
  • January 06, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 06, 2022: [Information - Felony]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • November 15, 2021: [Continue Trial]
September, 2021
  • September 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • September 07, 2021: [Stipulation]
  • September 07, 2021: [Continue Trial]
July, 2021
  • July 02, 2021: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Stipulation]
  • June 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • June 28, 2021: [Continue Trial]
  • June 24, 2021: [Endorsed Order - Trial Status Report]
  • June 16, 2021: [Trial Notice]
  • June 16, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines PUBLIC]
  • June 16, 2021: [Order]
  • June 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • June 15, 2021: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
  • June 15, 2021: [Stipulation to Detention and/or Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • June 15, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • June 03, 2021: [Hearing Notice]
  • June 02, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • June 02, 2021: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • June 02, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.