U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00094-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Roy
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • September 14, 2022: [Request to Dismiss Probation Petition]
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Judgment]
  • July 19, 2022: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
  • July 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • July 19, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • July 19, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • July 05, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • July 01, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • March 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Bail]
  • March 30, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 30, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment/Plea Hearing]
  • March 30, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • March 29, 2022: [Bail]
  • March 28, 2022: [Juror Questionnaires]
  • March 25, 2022: [Status Report]
  • March 25, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 25, 2022: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • March 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • March 24, 2022: [Terminate Motions PUBLIC]
  • March 23, 2022: [Notice - Other]
  • March 23, 2022: [Objection to Motion]
  • March 22, 2022: [Withdraw Document]
  • March 21, 2022: [Final Pretrial Conference]
  • March 21, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • March 17, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 16, 2022: [Motion Hearing Notice]
  • March 15, 2022: [Detention Order]
  • March 11, 2022: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
  • March 10, 2022: [Suppress]
  • March 09, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 04, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 03, 2022: [Detention Order - Temporary]
  • March 03, 2022: [Stipulation to Detention and/or Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • March 02, 2022: [Arrest]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Order]
  • January 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • January 28, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • January 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • January 10, 2022: [Continue Trial]
  • January 06, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 02, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 01, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2021
  • November 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • November 10, 2021: [Continue Trial]
  • November 02, 2021: [Bail Revocation Hearing]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 15, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • October 15, 2021: [Petition on Probation/SR/Bail - Order - Summons/Public Warrant]
September, 2021
  • September 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • September 07, 2021: [Continue Trial]
July, 2021
  • July 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • July 14, 2021: [Continue Trial]
  • July 07, 2021: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 07, 2021: [Endorsed Order - Trial Status Report]
  • July 07, 2021: [Trial Notice]
  • July 07, 2021: [Endorsed Order - Brady]
  • July 07, 2021: [Order]
  • July 01, 2021: [Hearing Notice]
June, 2021
  • June 21, 2021: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • June 17, 2021: [Initial Appearance/Arraignment]
  • June 17, 2021: [Consent to Video/Telephonic Conference Waiver to Appear in Person]
  • June 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • June 17, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • June 17, 2021: [Order]
  • June 15, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • June 02, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • June 02, 2021: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • June 02, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.