U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00097-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Guillermo-Graseki
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Letter]
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [CJA 20 Payment Information]
  • February 14, 2022: [CJA 21 Payment Information]
November, 2021
  • November 16, 2021: [Judgment]
  • November 15, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • November 12, 2021: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
  • November 12, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • November 05, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum]
August, 2021
  • August 11, 2021: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
  • August 09, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment/Plea Hearing]
June, 2021
  • June 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 09, 2021: [Continue]
  • June 08, 2021: [Hearing Notice]
  • June 08, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • June 08, 2021: [Acknowledgment and Waiver of Rights]
  • June 07, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.