U.S. District Court for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-mj-00081-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Helstein
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 20, 2021: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • September 13, 2021: [Extend Time to Indict]
  • September 10, 2021: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
August, 2021
  • August 11, 2021: [Terminate Motions PUBLIC]
  • August 11, 2021: [Extend Time to Indict]
  • August 11, 2021: [Continue Trial]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • July 20, 2021: [Clerk's Notice - Filing Due]
  • July 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend Time to Indict]
  • July 09, 2021: [Extend Time to Indict]
  • July 09, 2021: [ECF - Filing Error - Action Required]
  • July 09, 2021: [Continue]
June, 2021
  • June 22, 2021: [Endorsed Order - Brady]
  • June 22, 2021: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 22, 2021: [Stipulation to Detention and/or Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • June 22, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 22, 2021: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • June 22, 2021: [Consent to Video/Telephonic Conference Waiver to Appear in Person]
  • June 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • June 22, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • June 21, 2021: [Order]
  • June 17, 2021: [Hearing Notice]
  • June 16, 2021: [Removal/Rule 5c 3 Documents Received]
  • June 09, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • June 09, 2021: [Arrest - Other District]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.