U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00098-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ducharme
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
  • December 12, 2022: [Early Termination of Probation]
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [CJA 20 Payment Information]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • December 14, 2021: [Satisfaction of Judgment]
November, 2021
  • November 05, 2021: [Judgment]
  • November 04, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • November 04, 2021: [Order]
October, 2021
  • October 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 12, 2021: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
  • October 11, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • October 11, 2021: [Continue]
June, 2021
  • June 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • June 15, 2021: [Consent to Video/Telephonic Conference Waiver to Appear in Person]
  • June 15, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • June 10, 2021: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
  • June 10, 2021: [Hearing Notice]
  • June 10, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 10, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.