U.S. District Court for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-mj-00083-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mackillop
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 22, 2021: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • July 21, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • July 21, 2021: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 21, 2021: [Clerk's Notice - Filing Due]
  • July 20, 2021: [Bail Hearing]
  • July 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Bail]
  • July 15, 2021: [Bail]
  • July 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend Time to Indict]
  • July 09, 2021: [Extend Time to Indict]
  • July 09, 2021: [ECF - Filing Error - Action Required]
  • July 09, 2021: [Continue]
June, 2021
  • June 24, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • June 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 23, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 23, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 15, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 15, 2021: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 15, 2021: [Order]
  • June 14, 2021: [Detention Order - Temporary]
  • June 14, 2021: [Stipulation to Detention and/or Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • June 14, 2021: [Endorsed Order - Brady]
  • June 14, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 14, 2021: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • June 14, 2021: [Consent to Video/Telephonic Conference Waiver to Appear in Person]
  • June 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • June 14, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • June 11, 2021: [Order]
  • June 11, 2021: [Hearing Notice]
  • June 11, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • June 11, 2021: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.