U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00104-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ayala
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • January 03, 2023: [Continue Trial]
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • October 18, 2022: [Continue Trial]
September, 2022
  • September 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Medical Treatment]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • August 26, 2022: [Continue Trial]
  • August 25, 2022: [Medical Treatment]
June, 2022
  • June 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • June 02, 2022: [Continue Trial]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • February 16, 2022: [Addendum]
  • February 16, 2022: [Continue Trial]
  • February 11, 2022: [Trial Reminder]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 19, 2022: [Reset Trial Deadlines PUBLIC]
  • January 19, 2022: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
October, 2021
  • October 21, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • October 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 19, 2021: [Order]
  • October 13, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 12, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • October 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • October 07, 2021: [Continue Trial]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Endorsed Order - Trial Status Report]
July, 2021
  • July 19, 2021: [Order]
  • July 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • July 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • July 13, 2021: [Continue Trial]
  • July 01, 2021: [Hearing Notice]
June, 2021
  • June 23, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • June 17, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 15, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • June 15, 2021: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • June 15, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.