U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00100-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Collier
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [CJA 21 Payment Information]
  • May 16, 2022: [CJA 20 Payment Information]
March, 2022
  • March 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 15, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • March 08, 2022: [Final Pretrial Conference]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Reset Trial Deadlines PUBLIC]
  • January 19, 2022: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • November 18, 2021: [Continue Trial]
  • November 17, 2021: [Trial Reminder]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Objection to Motion]
  • October 15, 2021: [ECF - Filing Error - Info Only]
  • October 15, 2021: [Memorandum]
  • October 15, 2021: [Suppress]
September, 2021
  • September 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • September 07, 2021: [Continue Trial]
July, 2021
  • July 13, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 01, 2021: [Endorsed Order - Trial Status Report]
  • July 01, 2021: [Trial Notice]
  • July 01, 2021: [Stipulation to Detention and/or Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • July 01, 2021: [Endorsed Order - Brady]
  • July 01, 2021: [Initial Appearance/Arraignment]
  • July 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • July 01, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • July 01, 2021: [Consent to Video/Telephonic Conference Waiver to Appear in Person]
  • July 01, 2021: [Order]
June, 2021
  • June 23, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • June 23, 2021: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • June 22, 2021: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
  • June 21, 2021: [Hearing Notice]
  • June 15, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • June 15, 2021: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • June 15, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.