U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00099-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Clemence
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 13, 2022: [Transcript]
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: [Judgment]
  • March 22, 2022: [Forfeiture Order]
  • March 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • March 22, 2022: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
  • March 22, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • March 21, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • March 21, 2022: [Order]
  • March 15, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • March 11, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • March 09, 2022: [Forfeiture]
December, 2021
  • December 07, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 07, 2021: [Order]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines PUBLIC]
  • November 29, 2021: [Hearing Notice]
  • November 29, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 18, 2021: [Trial Reminder]
September, 2021
  • September 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • September 13, 2021: [Continue Trial]
July, 2021
  • July 07, 2021: [Continue Trial]
  • July 07, 2021: [Bail Hearing]
  • July 07, 2021: [Order]
  • July 06, 2021: [Objection to Motion]
  • July 06, 2021: [Protective Order]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • June 29, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • June 25, 2021: [Bail]
  • June 25, 2021: [Exhibit List]
  • June 23, 2021: [Endorsed Order - Trial Status Report]
  • June 23, 2021: [Trial Notice]
  • June 22, 2021: [Detention Order]
  • June 22, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 22, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • June 17, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 16, 2021: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
  • June 15, 2021: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • June 15, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • June 15, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.