U.S. District Court for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00156-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Paulino et al.
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 24, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 23, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 22, 2021: [Stipulation to Detention and/or Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • June 21, 2021: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 21, 2021: [Consent to Video/Telephonic Conference Waiver to Appear in Person]
  • June 21, 2021: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • June 21, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 21, 2021: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • June 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • June 21, 2021: [Order]
  • June 17, 2021: [Endorsed Order - Brady]
  • June 17, 2021: [Stipulation to Detention and/or Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • June 17, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 17, 2021: [Consent to Video/Telephonic Conference Waiver to Appear in Person]
  • June 17, 2021: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • June 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • June 17, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • June 17, 2021: [Order]
  • June 16, 2021: [Consent to Video/Telephonic Conference Waiver to Appear in Person]
  • June 16, 2021: [Endorsed Order - Brady]
  • June 16, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • June 16, 2021: [Detention Order - Temporary]
  • June 16, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 16, 2021: [Order]
  • June 16, 2021: [Hearing Notice]
  • June 16, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • June 16, 2021: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.