U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00103-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Murphy
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • November 15, 2022: [Rescheduling Motion Hearing Notice]
  • November 04, 2022: [Continue Trial]
  • November 03, 2022: [Objection to Motion]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Motion Hearing Notice]
  • October 20, 2022: [Suppress]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • August 12, 2022: [Continue Trial]
June, 2022
  • June 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • June 06, 2022: [Continue Trial]
May, 2022
  • May 19, 2022: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
April, 2022
  • April 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • April 05, 2022: [Continue Trial]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Continue Trial]
  • March 22, 2022: [Trial Reminder]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • January 12, 2022: [Continue Trial]
December, 2021
  • December 14, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 02, 2021: [Status of Counsel]
  • December 02, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • November 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 19, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • July 22, 2021: [Continue Trial]
  • July 21, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 20, 2021: [Extend Time]
  • July 16, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • July 15, 2021: [Extend Time]
  • July 07, 2021: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • July 06, 2021: [Extend Time]
  • July 02, 2021: [Endorsed Order - Trial Status Report]
  • July 02, 2021: [Trial Notice]
  • July 02, 2021: [Endorsed Order - Brady]
  • July 02, 2021: [Stipulation to Detention and/or Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • July 02, 2021: [Initial Appearance/Arraignment]
  • July 02, 2021: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • July 02, 2021: [Consent to Video/Telephonic Conference Waiver to Appear in Person]
  • July 02, 2021: [Order]
  • July 01, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • July 01, 2021: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • July 01, 2021: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
  • July 01, 2021: [Hearing Notice]
June, 2021
  • June 17, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • June 17, 2021: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • June 17, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.