U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00107-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rodriguez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 07, 2022: [Judgment]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • June 30, 2022: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
May, 2022
  • May 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Continue]
  • April 25, 2022: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • April 21, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum]
March, 2022
  • March 03, 2022: [Substitute Attorney]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 27, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 27, 2022: [Order]
  • January 12, 2022: [Hearing Notice]
  • January 12, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
November, 2021
  • November 18, 2021: [Corrective Entry]
  • November 18, 2021: [Trial Reminder]
  • November 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • November 10, 2021: [Continue Trial]
September, 2021
  • September 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • September 08, 2021: [Continue Trial]
July, 2021
  • July 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • July 16, 2021: [Continue Trial]
  • July 15, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 09, 2021: [Endorsed Order - Trial Status Report]
  • July 09, 2021: [Trial Notice]
  • July 09, 2021: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
June, 2021
  • June 22, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • June 22, 2021: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • June 22, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.