U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00109-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Frederickson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 14, 2021: [CJA 20 Payment Information]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Judgment - Revocation]
  • October 27, 2021: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
  • October 27, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Psychiatric Report]
August, 2021
  • August 06, 2021: [Notice - Other]
July, 2021
  • July 09, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines PUBLIC]
  • July 09, 2021: [Psychiatric Exam Order]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order toDetermine Competency]
  • June 25, 2021: [Order to Determine Competency]
  • June 25, 2021: [Stipulation to Detention and/or Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • June 25, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • June 25, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • June 25, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • June 25, 2021: [Consent to Video/Telephonic Conference Waiver to Appear in Person]
  • June 25, 2021: [Order]
  • June 24, 2021: [Hearing Notice]
  • June 24, 2021: [Case Reassigned]
  • June 24, 2021: [Recusal Order]
  • June 24, 2021: [Arrest]
  • June 23, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • June 23, 2021: [Petition on Probation/SR/Bail - Order - Warrant]
  • June 23, 2021: [Transfer In/Probationer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.