U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00105-1
  • Case Name: USA v. McFadden
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • July 22, 2022: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
June, 2022
  • June 13, 2022: [Judgment]
  • June 13, 2022: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
  • June 13, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • June 07, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 02, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum]
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 04, 2022: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • December 20, 2021: [Continue Trial]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Order]
  • October 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • October 05, 2021: [Continue Trial]
September, 2021
  • September 10, 2021: [Removal/Rule 5c 3 Documents Received]
August, 2021
  • August 16, 2021: [Stipulation]
  • August 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • August 04, 2021: [Order]
  • August 03, 2021: [Continue Trial]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Endorsed Order - Trial Status Report]
  • July 14, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 14, 2021: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • July 06, 2021: [Trial Notice]
  • July 06, 2021: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 06, 2021: [Endorsed Order - Brady]
  • July 06, 2021: [Initial Appearance/Arraignment]
  • July 06, 2021: [Consent to Video/Telephonic Conference Waiver to Appear in Person]
  • July 06, 2021: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • July 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • July 06, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • July 06, 2021: [Order]
  • July 01, 2021: [Hearing Notice]
June, 2021
  • June 24, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • June 24, 2021: [Arrest - Other District]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.