U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-00153-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gonzalez-Blas
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 13, 2022: [Judgment]
  • May 13, 2022: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
  • May 12, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • May 03, 2022: [Continue]
April, 2022
  • April 19, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • April 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 18, 2022: [Continue]
January, 2022
  • January 13, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 07, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Trial Reminder]
October, 2021
  • October 05, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • October 01, 2021: [Continue Trial]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • September 13, 2021: [Continue Trial]
July, 2021
  • July 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • July 14, 2021: [Continue Trial]
  • July 14, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 12, 2021: [Endorsed Order - Trial Status Report]
  • July 02, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • July 02, 2021: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 02, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 02, 2021: [Order]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
  • June 30, 2021: [Trial Notice]
  • June 29, 2021: [Detention Order - Temporary]
  • June 29, 2021: [Endorsed Order - Brady]
  • June 29, 2021: [Initial Appearance/Arraignment]
  • June 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • June 29, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • June 29, 2021: [Consent to Video/Telephonic Conference Waiver to Appear in Person]
  • June 29, 2021: [Order]
  • June 28, 2021: [Hearing Notice]
  • June 28, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • June 28, 2021: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.