U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00110-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Garland
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 08, 2022: [Judgment]
  • February 04, 2022: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
  • February 04, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • February 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • February 04, 2022: [Forfeiture Order]
  • February 04, 2022: [Addendum]
  • February 04, 2022: [Forfeiture]
  • February 01, 2022: [Addendum]
  • February 01, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Order]
  • January 25, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • January 11, 2022: [Continue]
  • January 10, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 10, 2022: [Bail Revocation Hearing]
  • January 10, 2022: [Removal/Rule 5c 3 Documents Received]
  • January 05, 2022: [Arrest - Other District]
December, 2021
  • December 09, 2021: [Continue]
September, 2021
  • September 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 14, 2021: [Continue]
August, 2021
  • August 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • August 02, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
July, 2021
  • July 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • July 15, 2021: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 15, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • July 15, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment/Plea Hearing]
  • July 15, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • July 15, 2021: [Initial Appearance/Arraignment]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Hearing Notice]
  • June 29, 2021: [Organizational Victim]
  • June 29, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 29, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.