U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00111-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Taylor
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Transcript]
  • March 22, 2022: [Transcript]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Forfeiture Order]
  • November 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • November 17, 2021: [Judgment]
  • November 17, 2021: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
  • November 17, 2021: [Order]
  • November 15, 2021: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
  • November 08, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • November 08, 2021: [Order]
  • November 05, 2021: [Forfeiture]
  • November 02, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • July 26, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment/Plea Hearing]
  • July 26, 2021: [Order]
  • July 21, 2021: [Hearing Notice]
  • July 21, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 13, 2021: [Clerk's Notice - Filing Due]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend Time to Indict]
  • June 30, 2021: [Extend Time to Indict]
  • June 29, 2021: [Notice - Show Cause Hearing Regarding Indictment]
  • June 29, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.