U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00112-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mehlhorn
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Return of Property]
  • January 11, 2022: [Transcript]
  • January 11, 2022: [Return of Property]
  • January 07, 2022: [Transcript]
December, 2021
  • December 02, 2021: [Judgment]
  • December 01, 2021: [Sentencing]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
August, 2021
  • August 06, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment/Plea Hearing]
  • August 06, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
July, 2021
  • July 06, 2021: [Hearing Notice]
  • July 06, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 06, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.