U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00113-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Spaulding et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Forfeiture Order]
  • December 22, 2022: [Collateral Returned]
  • December 05, 2022: [Transcript]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Forfeiture]
  • November 23, 2022: [Collateral Return Acknowledgment]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 22, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 22, 2022: [Judgment]
  • November 17, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • November 17, 2022: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
  • November 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 03, 2022: [Continue]
  • November 02, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Miscellaneous Filing]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 22, 2022: [Hearing Notice]
  • July 22, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 22, 2022: [Judgment]
  • July 21, 2022: [Acknowledgment of Sentencing Options]
  • July 21, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • July 15, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 06, 2022: [Forfeiture Order]
  • July 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • July 05, 2022: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • July 05, 2022: [Forfeiture]
  • July 01, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum]
June, 2022
  • June 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 07, 2022: [Continue]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Stipulation]
  • May 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • May 24, 2022: [Order]
  • May 23, 2022: [Continue Trial]
  • May 09, 2022: [Stipulation]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Clerk's Notice - Filing Due]
  • April 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • April 21, 2022: [Order]
  • April 21, 2022: [Continue Trial]
  • April 21, 2022: [Continue]
  • April 12, 2022: [Trial Reminder]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • February 25, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 24, 2022: [Miscellaneous Filing]
  • February 23, 2022: [Order]
  • February 23, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • February 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • February 16, 2022: [Continue Trial]
  • February 10, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
January, 2022
  • January 14, 2022: [Order]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • November 17, 2021: [Continue Trial]
August, 2021
  • August 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 20, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 20, 2021: [In Chambers Conference]
  • August 17, 2021: [Miscellaneous Filing]
  • August 12, 2021: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
  • August 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • August 06, 2021: [Continue Trial]
  • August 06, 2021: [Addendum]
  • August 03, 2021: [Cure Notice - Action Requested]
  • August 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • August 03, 2021: [Continue Trial]
  • August 03, 2021: [Motion Hearing Notice]
  • August 03, 2021: [Order]
  • August 03, 2021: [Motion Referred]
  • August 02, 2021: [Trial Notice]
  • August 02, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • August 02, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • August 02, 2021: [Order]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Objection to Motion]
  • July 27, 2021: [Endorsed Order - Trial Status Report]
  • July 21, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 20, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 15, 2021: [Detention Order]
  • July 15, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 14, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 14, 2021: [Motion Referred]
  • July 14, 2021: [Detention]
  • July 14, 2021: [Trial Notice]
  • July 13, 2021: [Detention Order - Temporary]
  • July 13, 2021: [Endorsed Order - Brady]
  • July 13, 2021: [Initial Appearance/Arraignment]
  • July 13, 2021: [Order]
  • July 13, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 13, 2021: [Change of Address]
  • July 13, 2021: [Hearing Notice]
  • July 13, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • July 13, 2021: [Arrest]
  • July 13, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • July 13, 2021: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • July 13, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • July 13, 2021: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • July 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Case]
  • July 13, 2021: [Seal Case]
  • July 13, 2021: [Indictment - Sealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.