U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00115-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Paulino et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Continue]
December, 2022
  • December 23, 2022: [Transcript]
  • December 06, 2022: [Continue]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Substitute Attorney]
September, 2022
  • September 07, 2022: [CJA 20 Payment Information]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 06, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment/Plea Hearing]
  • September 06, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 06, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • September 06, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 06, 2022: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
August, 2022
  • August 11, 2022: [Judgment]
  • August 10, 2022: [Sentencing]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • July 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • July 28, 2022: [Continue Trial]
  • July 20, 2022: [Final Pretrial Conference]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • June 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • June 21, 2022: [Continue Trial]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 15, 2022: [Notice - Other]
  • April 15, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • March 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • March 18, 2022: [Continue Trial]
February, 2022
  • February 02, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Stipulation to Detention and/or Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • January 27, 2022: [Hearing Notice]
  • January 27, 2022: [Arrest]
  • January 18, 2022: [Reset Trial Deadlines PUBLIC]
  • January 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • January 18, 2022: [Continue Trial]
  • January 13, 2022: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • November 24, 2021: [Continue Trial]
  • November 15, 2021: [Trial Reminder]
October, 2021
  • October 14, 2021: [Bail Revocation Hearing]
  • October 07, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: [Petition on Probation/SR/Bail - Order - Summons/Public Warrant]
  • September 09, 2021: [Reset Trial Deadlines PUBLIC]
  • September 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • September 08, 2021: [Terminate Motions PUBLIC]
  • September 08, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 08, 2021: [Continue Trial]
  • September 01, 2021: [Endorsed Order - Trial Status Report]
August, 2021
  • August 19, 2021: [Trial Notice]
  • August 18, 2021: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • August 18, 2021: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
  • August 05, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 04, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 03, 2021: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • August 03, 2021: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
  • August 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 03, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines PUBLIC]
  • August 02, 2021: [Continue]
July, 2021
  • July 15, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 15, 2021: [Hearing Notice]
  • July 13, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • July 13, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • July 13, 2021: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • July 13, 2021: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • July 13, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.