U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00114-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bosworth
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 01, 2022: [Judgment]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • October 26, 2022: [Vacate]
  • October 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • October 26, 2022: [Forfeiture]
  • October 26, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • October 24, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • October 21, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 11, 2022: [Case Reassigned]
  • August 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 05, 2022: [Continue]
April, 2022
  • April 15, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 11, 2022: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 11, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 23, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • February 24, 2022: [Continue Trial]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • January 19, 2022: [Final Pretrial Conference]
  • January 13, 2022: [Continue Trial]
  • January 13, 2022: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • November 19, 2021: [Continue Trial]
  • November 15, 2021: [Trial Reminder]
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • August 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial]
  • August 13, 2021: [Continue Trial]
  • August 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • August 09, 2021: [Extend Time]
  • August 06, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • August 05, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 04, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
July, 2021
  • July 23, 2021: [Endorsed Order - Trial Status Report]
  • July 21, 2021: [Endorsed Order - Brady]
  • July 21, 2021: [Trial Notice]
  • July 21, 2021: [Stipulation to Detention and/or Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • July 21, 2021: [Initial Appearance/Arraignment]
  • July 21, 2021: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • July 21, 2021: [Consent to Video/Telephonic Conference Waiver to Appear in Person]
  • July 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • July 21, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • July 21, 2021: [Order]
  • July 20, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 19, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • July 19, 2021: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • July 15, 2021: [Arrest]
  • July 14, 2021: [Hearing Notice]
  • July 13, 2021: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • July 13, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • July 13, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.