U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:08-cr-00075-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Silva
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence]
  • September 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
  • September 13, 2021: [Response - not to motion]
  • September 03, 2021: [Addendum]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Order]
  • August 30, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 23, 2021: [Addendum]
  • August 20, 2021: [Addendum]
  • August 19, 2021: [Objection to Motion]
  • August 13, 2021: [Compassionate Release]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • July 27, 2021: [Extend Time]
  • July 26, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 21, 2021: [Order]
  • July 19, 2021: [Reduce Sentence]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.